judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00238-CR
08-81-00238-CR
10/30/1981
Other Felony
Rice, Tony Allen
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
08/05/1982Mandate Issued
05/19/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/19/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/18/1982Submitted
02/18/1982Submission
02/18/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
307673
4 yrs.