judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CROCKETT (THOMAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34850
Short Caption:CROCKETT (THOMAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 36312
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C144007Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/14/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/20/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/20/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-08864
09/30/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Jeffrey Banks shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09374
10/12/1999MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Clarify Supreme Court Order Dated September 30, 1999. 99-09849
10/12/1999MotionFiled Motion. Application for Extension of Time. 99-09850
10/29/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The Clark County Public Defender's office informs this court that they did not represent appellant in the proceedings below. It appears that appellant was acting in proper person in the district court. The provisions of NRAP 3C do not apply to this appeal. fn1[Although appellant has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person, having considered appellant's document received on October 6, 1999 to the extent that appellant seeks to have the provisions of NRAP 3C applied to this appeal, such request is denied]. The Clark County Public Defender's office is relieved of any further obligation in connection with this appeal. fn2[The Clark County Public Defender's motion for an extension to file the fast track statement in this appeal is denied, as moot]. Within 120 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court]. 99-10596
02/14/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on 02/11/00. 00-02317
02/14/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/27/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. 'ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED.' fn6[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP01A-MS/DA/RR 01-10813
07/24/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10860
07/24/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 2, 2001. 01-10860