judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

HAGOS A. SEYOUM V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1385
Short Caption:HAGOS A. SEYOUM V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Destruction Of Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3311-10Filed Date:11/01/2010

Opening Event Date:11/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/09/2012Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/02/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantHagos A. Seyoum Y
Ruth ZanoniYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Katherine SawyerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/10/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Ruth Zanoni, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/10/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Ruth Zanoni, Esquire
12/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (158pgs/Tape) 9/23/10 proc.
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (109pgs/Tape) 10/4/10 proc. w/CD
12/16/2010RECORD COPIES
12/16/2010RECORD INDEX
12/16/2010FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (Superior Court filing - Restitution Information)
01/06/2011LETTER - from aplt's counsel notifying the court of new telephone number and email address
03/29/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (26pgs/Tape) 10/29/10 proc. w/CD attached
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #5 (10pgs/Tape) 8/17/10 proc.
07/26/2011FiledSupplemental Record - #6 (12pgs/Tape) 10/20/10 proc. w/CD
07/28/2011FiledBriefing Order
09/09/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
09/27/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until December 5, 2011
12/13/2011FiledOrder directing appellant to submit the brief and limited appendix, accompanied by a motion for leave w/in 15 days.
12/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
12/29/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief and Appendix until the Record has been Supplemented (Appellant)Granted
01/09/2012FiledSupplemental Record - #7 (59pgs/Tape) 10/4/10 proc. w/CD
01/09/2012FiledRecord Completed
01/09/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief - until completion of transcripts (Amended motion) (Appellant)Granted
01/13/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motions to the extent that appellant's brief and limited appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date ofh this order
01/20/2012FiledBrief (Appellant) appendix attached
01/20/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
02/16/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellee)Granted
03/06/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief on or before March 23, 2012
03/22/2012FiledMotion To Remand (Appellee)Granted
04/02/2012FiledOrder Granting appellee's motion to remand this case
04/02/2012FiledRemanded
04/02/2012FiledMandate