judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00228-CR
08-81-00228-CR
10/30/1981
Burglary
White, Malcham Jerome
Texas, The State of
No
1st Court of Appeals
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
09/10/1982Mandate Issued
06/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/30/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/18/1982Submitted
02/18/1982Submission
02/18/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Submission
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
10/30/1981Case ready to be set
10/30/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/10/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
302854
10 years