judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00209-CR
08-81-00209-CR
10/29/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Shell, Harold Loyice, Jr.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/05/1984Shuck purged
03/22/1983Mandate Issued
02/17/1983Case Returned from Higher CourtRefused
11/22/1982Petition for Discretionary Review
10/06/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/03/1982Submitted
07/07/1982Submission
05/10/1982Waiver of brief, list of authorities, etc.
05/03/1982Brief Filed
04/21/1982Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/05/1982Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
03/08/1982Brief Filed
02/17/1982Record filed.
12/30/1981Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1981Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
11/10/1981Motion for Extension Statement of Facts DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/29/1981Motion - Extension to File Statement of Facts filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/22/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
161st District Court
Ector
B-12,002
99 Yrs.