judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00075-CR
09-81-00075-CR
10/30/1981
Forgery
Edwards, James Francis aka William Earl Riley
Texas, The State of
No
14th Court of Appeals
10/30/1981
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/04/1982Mandate Issued
12/09/1981Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
11/30/1981Motion for Rehearing Filed
11/10/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/30/1981Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/04/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
230th District Court
Harris
Honorable Monte D. Lawlis
300561
10 Years