judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRUCE LEON VANKOOTEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0205)
Case Number:S-08-0205Case Docketed On:09/24/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:BRUCE LEON VANKOOTEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:BRUCE LEON VANKOOTEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantBruce Leon VanKootenDion James Custis
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 59
Citation:206 P.3d 388

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/24/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/24/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/10/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
11/10/2008Event - Hardcopy receivedEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/23/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/24/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/09/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/21/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/23/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Exhibits; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/23/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/03/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
04/29/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order, affirming. Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
05/15/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
05/15/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
05/19/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 5/18/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal