judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00098-CV
08-81-00098-CV
09/21/1981
Miscellaneous civil
Hamby Company, The and First National Bank of Plainview
Seminole State Bank
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/15/2013Case sent to State Archives
06/04/1984Shuck purged
10/14/1983No description available.
04/22/1983No description available.Motion or Writ Granted
02/22/1983No description available.
02/22/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/14/1983No description available.
01/19/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/07/1983Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/22/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
12/22/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
07/16/1982Submitted
07/16/1982Submission
07/16/1982Submitted
06/02/1982Submission
03/25/1982Case ready to be set
11/25/1981Brief Filed
11/25/1981Motion for Ext. of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/12/1981Motion for Extension of time to file brief filed
10/16/1981Brief Filed
09/21/1981Transcript Filed
09/21/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/15/2013Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
UnknownAppellee
UnknownAppellant
Trial Court Information
106th District Court
Gaines
Honorable GEORGE HANSARD
9149