judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00287-CR
04-81-00287-CR
09/22/1981
Capital Murder
Gamez, Jesus Martinez
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/09/1987Mandate Issued
10/09/1987Mandate Issued
09/23/1987Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/16/1987No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/06/1984Information regarding cause received
12/28/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/28/1983Petition for Review Filed
12/15/1983Information regarding cause received
11/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/02/1983Submitted
11/02/1983Submission
11/02/1983Appeal Reinstated
11/02/1983Appeal Reinstated
11/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/02/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/02/1983Submission
11/02/1983Submitted
07/05/1983No Description Available.
07/05/1983No Description Available.
05/02/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
03/30/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
02/10/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/09/1983Petition for Review Filed
01/10/1983Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
12/20/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/08/1982Opinion issuedAbated
12/08/1982Opinion issuedAbated
12/08/1982Opinion issuedAbated
06/16/1982Submitted
06/16/1982Submission
06/16/1982Submitted
05/21/1982Submission
04/01/1982Requests Oral Argument
03/16/1982Case ready to be set
03/16/1982Requests Oral Argument
03/16/1982Brief Filed
03/16/1982Case ready to be set
03/08/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/11/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/18/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/15/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
12/30/1981Supplemental Brief Filed
12/30/1981Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/28/1981Supplemental Brief Received
12/28/1981Motion f/l/file Supp. Brief Filed
12/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/18/1981Brief Filed
12/18/1981Brief Recd (If in excess of page limit and/or late)
12/10/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
10/05/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
09/29/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/22/1981Record Filed
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/20/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
10/09/1987Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
79-CR-0594-B
LIFE