judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00286-CR
04-81-00286-CR
09/22/1981
Other Drug Possession
Jones, Michael E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/07/1984Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
12/07/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/07/1983Appeal Reinstated
12/07/1983Appeal Reinstated
12/07/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/06/1983Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/05/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
03/09/1983Opinion issuedAbated
03/09/1983Opinion issuedAbated
11/23/1982Submission
11/23/1981Submission
11/23/1981Submitted
09/22/1981Record Filed
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/19/1981Record Approved
12/01/1980Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable ROY R. BARRERA, SR.
80-CR-0947
5 Years Probation