judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00040-CR
09-81-00040-CR
09/22/1981
Burglary
Hines, Keith Earl
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/04/1982Mandate Issued
03/17/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/12/1981Brief Filed
10/01/1981Brief Filed
09/22/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/04/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
38884
15 Years