judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-81-00032-CR
10-81-00032-CR
09/18/1981
Driving While Intoxicated
Lester Franklin Waits
State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/2007Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/01/1982Case stored
02/01/1982Mandate issued by this Court
11/30/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/19/1981Submitted
09/18/1981Notice of Appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/16/2007Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 1
McLennan
63590
20 Months