judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00272-CR
04-81-00272-CR
09/22/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lara, Virgilio E.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/20/1984Mandate Issued
08/20/1984Mandate Issued
08/06/1984No New Event but Update in Calendar
06/27/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/27/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1984Brief Filed
06/21/1984Case ready to be set
06/21/1984Submission
06/21/1984Submitted
05/30/1984Appeal Reinstated
05/30/1984Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
05/29/1984Brief Filed
04/25/1984Opinion issuedAbated
04/25/1984Opinion issuedAbated
11/01/1983Submission
11/01/1983Submitted
09/26/1983Case ready to be set
09/26/1983Case ready to be set
12/30/1982Brief Filed
12/09/1982Brief Filed
12/09/1982Appeal Reinstated
11/10/1982Opinion issuedAbated
11/10/1982Opinion issuedAbated
11/03/1982Submission
11/03/1982Submission
11/03/1982Submitted
09/22/1981Record Filed
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
02/27/1979Record Approved
03/30/1978Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/02/2010Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
08/20/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Mike M. Machado
77-CR-2721-A
Life