judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00278-CR
04-81-00278-CR
09/22/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lopez, Gregorio
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/31/1994Case Forwarded to Higher Court
08/18/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
08/18/1983Mandate Issued
08/18/1983Mandate Issued
08/17/1983Case Returned from Higher Court
07/06/1983Higher Court DecisionRefused
05/04/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
04/28/1983Petition for Review Filed
03/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/30/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/18/1982Submission
05/18/1982Submission
05/18/1982Submitted
03/15/1982Brief Filed
03/15/1982Case ready to be set
03/15/1982Case ready to be set
03/05/1982Supplemental Brief Filed
02/10/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/03/1982Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/13/1982Brief Filed
11/30/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/23/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/22/1981No Description Available.
09/22/1981No Description Available.
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2013Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
08/18/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
187th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
79-CR-0282 &
99 yrs/20 yrs/LIFE