judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00269-CV
04-81-00269-CV
09/22/1981
Miscellaneous civil
In Re: K.R.H., Jr., a Juvenile
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/21/1983Mandate Issued
04/21/1983Mandate Issued
02/16/1983Opinion issuedReversed
02/16/1983Opinion issuedReversed
02/08/1983Submission
02/08/1983Submission
02/08/1983Submitted
01/04/1982Brief Filed
01/04/1982Case ready to be set
12/17/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/15/1981No Description Available.
12/15/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
11/23/1981Brief Filed
10/23/1981No Description Available.
10/13/1981No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/28/1981Motion to Amend Filed
09/25/1981No Description Available.
09/22/1981Exhibits Filed
09/22/1981No Description Available.
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/21/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
226th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Pat Priest
81-JUV-0425