judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 8th Court Of Appeals

Case: 08-81-00097-CR
08-81-00097-CR
09/22/1981
Robbery
Jefferson, Michael Angelo
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/04/1984Shuck purged
08/05/1982Mandate Issued
06/09/1982Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/07/1982Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/21/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/09/1982Submitted
04/09/1982Submission
04/09/1982Submitted
03/31/1982Submission
03/10/1982Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/1982Case ready to be set
02/24/1982No description available.
09/22/1981Brief Filed
09/22/1981Record filed.
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/05/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
UnknownCriminal - Appellant
UnknownCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
210th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam M. Paxson
36039-210
12 yrs.