judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00312-CR
04-81-00312-CR
09/22/1981
Burglary
Crooks, Lawrence
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
03/07/1985Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
03/07/1985Mandate Issued
03/07/1985Mandate Issued
10/31/1984Mot. EOT t/f Pet. for Disc. Review Disposed
10/31/1984Mot. EOT t/f Pet. for Disc. Review Filed
09/12/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/12/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/12/1984Motion for Rehearing En Banc DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/12/1984Motion for Rehearing Granted
09/12/1984Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/12/1984Submission
09/12/1984Submitted
08/04/1983Motion for Rehearing En Banc Filed
07/20/1983Opinion issuedReversed
07/20/1983Opinion issuedReversed
06/14/1983Submission
06/14/1983Submission
06/14/1983Submitted
10/07/1981Case ready to be set
10/07/1981Brief Filed
10/07/1981Case ready to be set
09/22/1981Record Filed
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/08/1981Brief Filed
06/09/1981Record Approved
02/12/1981Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
186th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable James E. Barlow
80-CR-1846
15 Years