judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00271-CR
04-81-00271-CR
09/22/1981
Burglary
Boatwright, Kenneth W.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
06/27/1983Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
05/26/1983Mandate Issued
05/26/1983Mandate Issued
03/30/1983Opinion issuedDismissed
03/30/1983Opinion issuedDismissed
02/25/1983Submission
02/25/1983Appeal Reinstated
02/25/1983Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law Filed
02/25/1983Appeal Reinstated
02/25/1983Submission
02/25/1983Submitted
12/01/1982Opinion issuedAbated
12/01/1982Opinion issuedAbated
11/03/1982Submission
11/03/1982Submission
11/03/1982Submitted
09/22/1981Record Filed
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable H Frank Garcia
75-CR-563
5 years