judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MATTINGLY (DANA) VS. STATE C/W 31541

Case Information: 31154
Short Caption:MATTINGLY (DANA) VS. STATE C/W 31541Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated:31154*, 31541 Related Case(s): 31541
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C89386Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/25/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/06/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/06/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
10/21/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 30992, 30993, 31133, 31152, 31154, 31177.
10/24/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. For Leave to Proceed in Proper Person.
02/25/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
02/25/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We elect to consolidate these appeals for disposition. Having reviewed the records on appeal, and for the reasons set forth above, we conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn3[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in these matters, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML. Nos. 31154, 31541. 00-16143
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16239
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16239