judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOHN FOREMAN V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1378
Short Caption:JOHN FOREMAN V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Homicide
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-26146-08Filed Date:11/01/2010

Opening Event Date:11/01/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/10/2012
Argued/Submitted:03/28/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/16/2013
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Foreman YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Stratton C. Strand YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/01/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/17/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
12/13/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (71 pgs/Hawkins) 4/30/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (34 pgs/Price) 5/5/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (361 pgs/Maddox) 5/10-11/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (107 pgs/Hill) 5/12/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (204 pgs/Hill) 5/13/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (136 pgs/Richer) 5/17/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (525 pgs/Kaczorowski) 5/18-21/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (227 pgs/Peterson-Hart) 5/24-25/10 proc.
05/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #9 (27 pgs/tape) 10/22/10 proc. w/cd
05/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/10/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
05/17/2011RECORD COPIES
05/17/2011RECORD INDEX
05/17/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #10 (SEALED orders)
06/20/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
06/24/2011 On consideration of appellant's unopposed motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before September 19, 2011. (Castillo)
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief to 12/19/11.
12/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 90 days (no oppo). Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension to file the brief and limited appendix to 3/19/12.
03/06/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)
06/08/2012FiledBrief (Appellant)
06/08/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant)
06/11/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)Granted
06/22/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellant)
07/02/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify - #11 (government exhibit #106)
07/05/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
07/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 9/10/12
09/10/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
09/12/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee) to 10/10/12
10/10/2012FiledMotion To Supplement The Record (Appellee)Granted
10/10/2012FiledBrief (Appellee)
10/10/2012FiledAppendix (Appellee)
10/10/2012FiledBriefing Completed
10/24/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Supplement The Record (Appellee) and the Clerk shall file the exhibits, contained in appellee's appendix as a supplemental record.
10/24/2012FiledSupplemental Record specify
11/28/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
11/28/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/10/2013FiledLetter From Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring (Appellee)
01/31/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/08/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Reply Brief (Appellant)Granted
03/11/2013FiledReceived - correction to certificate of service for reply brief filed 3/8/13. (Appellant)
03/14/2013FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
03/14/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
03/28/2013FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Oberly, Ferren
04/12/2013FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Ferren, Senior Judge.)
05/07/2013WithdrawnMandate
05/23/2013FiledMotion For Leave to File Petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc (Appellant)Granted
10/11/2013FiledTMC//MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE LODGED LATE PHRH/EN BANC
10/16/2013FiledORDER, SS, the MERITS DIVISION RECALLS the MANDATE and GRANTS the MOTION FOR LEAVE and the CLERK SHALL FILE the lodged PETITION FOR REHEARING/EN BANC and...
10/16/2013FiledPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Denied
10/16/2013FiledF/O the MERITS DIVISION DENIES the PETITION FOR REHEARING... and the PETITION FOR REHEARING EN BANC
10/16/2013FiledMandate
09/02/2014FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
02/15/2017FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant)Denied
03/08/2017FiledTMC - Recall Mandate // appoint counsel
07/11/2017FiledMotion To Appoint Counsel (Appellant)Denied
07/11/2017FiledMotion to Amend and Supplement Pleadings pending Motion to Recall the Mandate (Appellant)Granted
07/11/2017FiledOrder granting appellant's motion to amend motion to recall mandate FO appellant's motion for appointment of counsel is filed. FO that appellant's motion to recall mandate is denied. FO that appellant's motion for appointment of counsel is denied.