judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00703-CR
14-81-00703-CR
09/21/1981
Unauth. Use of Motor Vehical
McGee, Roger
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/06/1984Mandate Issued
06/07/1984Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/26/1984Record Filed (Both records FILED)
02/17/1984Statement of Facts past due - APP
06/08/1983Statement of Facts past due - APP
09/21/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/06/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
12,146
4 yrs. TDC