judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-81-00039-CR
09-81-00039-CR
09/22/1981
Other Felony
Shoemaker, James Ronald
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/11/1982Mandate Issued
11/25/1981Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/01/1981Brief Filed
09/23/1981Brief Filed
09/22/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/11/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
37775
5 Years