judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00275-CR
04-81-00275-CR
09/22/1981
Marijuana Possession
Berrones, Roy Pete
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
02/07/1984Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
02/06/1984Mandate Issued
12/13/1983Appeal Reinstated
12/13/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1983Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/13/1983Appeal Reinstated
12/12/1983Motion for Dismissal Filed
12/05/1983No New Event but Update in Calendar
06/15/1983Opinion issuedAbated
06/15/1983Opinion issuedAbated
11/09/1982Submission
11/09/1982Submission
11/09/1982Submitted
09/22/1981Record Filed
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/18/1980Record Approved
10/08/1979Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
144th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable John G. Yates
76-CR-2430-B
3 Years