judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-81-00282-CR
04-81-00282-CR
09/22/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Iruegas, Jr., Raul
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/10/1986Mandate Issued
10/10/1986Mandate Issued
09/24/1986Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
07/02/1986Higher Court DecisionAffirmed
05/04/1983Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
03/16/1983Case Forwarded to Higher Court
03/11/1983Petition for Review Filed
01/26/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/26/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/12/1982Submission
05/12/1982Submission
05/12/1982Submitted
12/30/1981Case ready to be set
12/30/1981Brief Filed
12/30/1981Case ready to be set
11/30/1981Brief Filed
10/05/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/29/1981Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
09/22/1981Record Filed
09/22/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/10/1986Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
226th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Ted Butler
80-CR-3409
60 years