judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HIGH (JUAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30814
Short Caption:HIGH (JUAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35858 , 42411 , 42412 , 42413 , 42501 , 52790
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C62509
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - 83C62508-1
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C62503
Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/05/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/30/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/30/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
08/06/1997Notice/IncomingReceived Proper Person Notice.
09/09/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record in each of the above-identified appeals, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 30663, 30780, 30782, 30797, 30814, 30837, 30853, 30874, 30882, 30885, 30910, 30950.
11/24/1997MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellant's motion for permission to file Opening Brief. (Received original and three copies - one copy returned.)
01/05/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2.
01/05/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
03/30/1998MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for an Expedited Hearing on Appellant's Appeal.
08/30/1999MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Appellant's Motion to direct lower district court to re-open Appellant's post-conviction proceedings and HabCorp. (Received original only.)
01/07/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Case Processing Order. Within 20 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to this court as separate supplemental records on appeal the complete records of the proceedings in district court case numbers C62508 and C62509.
02/02/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Supplement "A", Volumes 1 through 6 - District Court Case No. C62509. Mailed on 1/31/00.
02/02/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Supplement "B", Volumes 1 through 7 - District Court Case No. C62508. Mailed on 1/31/00.
04/13/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion to consolidate Appellant's Appeal. (Received original only.) (Nos. 30814 and 35858.)
05/10/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
06/01/2000MotionReceived Proper Person Motion. Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Appeal. (Received original only.)
07/12/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Appellant labeled his petition "Appellant's proper person Motion for Reconsideration of Order Dismissing Appeal." We elect to construe appellant's motion as a petition for rehearing. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML
07/28/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-13089
07/28/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
08/23/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on August 8, 2000. 00-13089