judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BLAKE J. NELSON ET AL V. D.C. RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSION

Case Information: 10-OA-0031
Short Caption:BLAKE J. NELSON ET AL V. D.C. RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSIONClassification:Original Jurisdiction - Original Actions - Mandamus
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:NV001-09Filed Date:11/05/2010

Opening Event Date:11/05/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Intervenor-RespondentKringle CorporationN
Richard W. LuchsNY
PetitionerBlake J. Nelson N
Carol S. BlumenthalNY
PetitionerWendy Nelson N
Carol S. BlumenthalNY
RespondentD.C. Rental Housing CommissionN
Todd S. KimNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/05/2010PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS with brown box of exhibits. Denied
11/05/2010FILING FEE of $100.00.
11/08/2010TMC - petition for writ of mandamus - opposition - motion for leave to intervene
11/16/2010 ORDERED that RESPONDENT DC RENTAL HOUSING COMMISSIONER PETER SZEGEDY-MASZAK and THE DISTRICT SHALL W/N 10 DAYS from the date of this order, FILE RESPONSES to the PWM. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM IS HEREBY HELD IN ABEYANCE pending the responses. (RDBRNW) (jl)
11/29/2010RESPONDENT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE- Petition for Writ of Mandamus
11/29/2010MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE on Behalf of Respondent and to File Opposition to Emergency Petition for Extraordinary Relief or Writ of Mandamus.
12/02/2010PETITIONER'S REPLY TO opposition of the District of Columbia to Petition for Writ of Mandamus
12/06/2010FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition
12/06/2010 ORDRED that the MOTION OF KLINGLE CORPORATION TO INTERVENE IS GRANTED and the Clerk SHALL FILE the LODGED OPPOSITION. It is *****MORE*****
12/06/2010INTERVENOR'S OPPOSITION
12/06/2010 FURTHER ORDERED that the PWM IS DENIED. (RDBRNW) (jl)