judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COADY (BRET) VS. STATE

Case Information: 30906
Short Caption:COADY (BRET) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR952739Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/15/1997How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/20/1997OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose.
08/20/1997Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/20/1997Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
09/09/1997Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. within 30 days from the date of this order. The clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court a certified copy of the complete trial court record of this appeal, as well as any previously prepared transcripts of the district court proceedings. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.]
09/15/1997Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy.
09/15/1997Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/15/1997BriefReceived Opening Brief. Appellant's Opening Brief.
10/15/1997MotionReceived Motion. Motion for Leave to File Papers, Motion, and Briefs.
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We conclude that appellant is not entitled to relief and that briefing and oral argument are unwarranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16107
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16204
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16204