judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HORSE CREEK CONSERVATION DISTRICT, a Wyoming Irrigation District; and PHASE 23, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., the WYOMING ATTORNEY GENERAL

Case Heading (S-08-0200)
Case Number:S-08-0200Case Docketed On:09/11/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:Eighth Judicial District Goshen CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:HORSE CREEK CONSERVATION DISTRICT, a Wyoming Irrigation District; and PHASE 23, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., the WYOMING ATTORNEY GENERAL
Full Title:HORSE CREEK CONSERVATION DISTRICT, a Wyoming Irrigation District; and PHASE 23, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability Company, Appellants (Defendants), v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., the WYOMING ATTORNEY GENERAL, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantHorse Creek Conservation District, a Wyoming Irrigation DistrictCurtis B. Buchhammer
AppellantPhase 23, LLC, a Wyoming Limited Liability CompanyCurtis B. Buchhammer
AppelleeAttorney General's Office - Attorney GeneralBruce A. Salzburg
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas
Brandi Lee Monger

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Property, Property -Servitudes, Statutes
Opinion Number:2009 WY 143
Citation:221 P.3d 306

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/11/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/11/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/11/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/11/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/29/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
10/30/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/16/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
12/16/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/05/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/09/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ryan Schelhaas for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
01/14/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/20/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Curtis Buchhammer for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Curtis B. Buchhammer for appellant; Ryant T. Schelhaas and Brandi Lee Monger, argument by Mr. Schelhaas for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/23/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming and remanding for reformation of the project agreement consistent with this decision.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/09/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/09/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/11/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/10/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal