judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2468
A-2468
12/15/1949
Application for Writ of Error
THOMAS A. HALL
UNITED STATES FIDELITY AND GUARANTY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/03/1950Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
12/24/1949Response to PetitionRespondent
12/15/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/15/1950Order from Lower Court filed
02/15/1950Motion to dismiss
02/03/1950Brief on the Merits
01/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
01/18/1950Document received (See Remarks)
12/24/1949Response to Petition
12/16/1949Letter Filed
12/15/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/15/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Thomas A. HallPetitioner
United States Fidelity and Guaranty CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information