judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2498
A-2498
01/09/1950
Application for Writ of Error
G. C. HOWELL, ET AL.
OLA TURNER, ET VIR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/17/1950Amended motion for rehearingPetitioner
02/23/1950Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/27/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
01/09/1950Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/22/1950Order from Lower Court filed
03/17/1950Amended motion for rehearing
03/08/1950Order from Lower Court filed
02/23/1950Motion for Rehearing
01/27/1950Response to Petition
01/16/1950Motion for Extension of Time to File Response
01/09/1950Application for Writ of Error - Filed
01/09/1950Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Ola Turner, et virRespondent
G. C. Howell, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information