judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-2460
A-2460
12/13/1949
Application for Writ of Error
PEARL JUNE BEARDEN, FORMERLY PEARL JUNE KNIGHT
TROY RAY KNIGHT AND HEREFORD STATE BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/17/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/01/1950Brief on the MeritsRespondent
01/26/1950Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/13/1949Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/20/1950Response to Motion filed
04/17/1950Motion for Rehearing
04/05/1950Opinion issued
02/01/1950Brief on the Merits
01/26/1950Brief in Support of Petition
01/11/1950Document received (See Remarks)
12/13/1949Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/13/1949Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Troy Ray Knight and Hereford State BankRespondent
Pearl June Bearden, formerly Pearl June KnightPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information