Case Information: 97-CM-1958 | |||
Short Caption: | EDDIE D. HAYES V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | M11307-97 | Filed Date: | 12/05/1997 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 12/05/1997 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 09/29/1998 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 02/08/1999 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/21/1999 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 12/01/1999 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||||||||
Appellant | Eddie D. Hayes | Y |
| ||||||||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
12/05/1997 | NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by: Betty Jane Clark 168633 202 544-0134 | |||
12/23/1997 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Betty J. Clark, Esq. | |||
12/31/1997 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT (RT ordered) | |||
01/29/1998 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
07/08/1998 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (17 pgs. -- Tape) (10/21/97 proc.) | |||
09/29/1998 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (47 pgs/tape) 10/20/97 proc. | |||
09/29/1998 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
11/06/1998 | ORDER: The brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: GP) | |||
12/23/1998 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 1/7/99 | |||
12/29/1998 | ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and the brief of appellant shall be filed on or before January 7, 1999. (BY: JAC for GPJ) | |||
01/04/1999 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
02/08/1999 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
02/08/1999 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
02/23/1999 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
09/30/1999 | APPELLANT'S MOTION REQUESTING ORAL ARGUMENT | |||
10/06/1999 | ORDER appellant's motion to present oral agrument is granted for 10/21/99 at 1:55 p.m. (GP) | |||
10/21/1999 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/21/1999 | ARGUED (TE,GL,WS) William Dansie, Esquire, for appellant. Marianela Peralta, Esquire, for appellee. | |||
10/29/1999 | AFFIRMED MOJ (TE,GL,WS) | |||
12/01/1999 | MANDATE ISSUED |