judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDERSEN (BRANDON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34874
Short Caption:ANDERSEN (BRANDON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7506Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09078
10/04/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: August 30, 1999. Court Reporter: Lisa Manley. 99-09515
10/22/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10363
10/22/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10364
11/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11233
01/03/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 00-00019
01/31/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01504
01/31/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/08/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on February 2, 2000. 00-01504