judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WASHINGTON (KIKI) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34873
Short Caption:WASHINGTON (KIKI) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 45843
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C132388Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/23/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/23/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09052
10/12/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Paul Wommer shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-09840
10/27/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: March 8, 1996. To Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 99-10533
11/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. Stricken by order 03/23/00. 99-11113
11/22/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: November 18, 1999. Court Reporter: Kit MacDonald. 99-11628
11/23/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. Stricken by order 03/23/00. 99-11697
03/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The clerk of this court shall strike the fast track statement filed on November 10, 1999, and the State's Fast track response filed on November 23, 1999. Wommer shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a fast track statement and appendix that comport with NRAP 3C(e) or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Thereafter, the State shall have 20 days to file a fast track response. In the future, counsel for both parties are strongly cautioned to pay closer attention to the documents filed with this court and to comply with the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. Failure to do so will result in the imposition of significant monetary sanctions. (Stricken: Fast Track Statement filed 11/10/00 and the Fast Track Response filed 11/23/99). 00-04609
04/17/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-06105
05/19/2000Order/CounselFiled Order/Remand for Designation of Counsel. On April 17, 2000, Wommer filed with this court a motion to withdraw as appellant's counsel in this appeal. The motion is granted. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, district court shall have 30 days to appoint counsel. Otherwise, district court shall order that within 30 days, appellant must retain appellate counsel and appellate counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. District court: 5 days to transmit a copy of the the district court order to this court and serve a copy of this order of remand on appellate counsel. Appellate counsel: 10 days to file a notice of appearance with the clerk of this court. The fast track statement shall be filed with this court within 30 days of appellate counsel's appearance. Thereafter, the State shall have 20 days to file the fast track response. 00-08414
06/29/2000Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of minute order filed in district court on June 27, 2000, appointing Gregory L. Denue as counsel for appellant. 00-11116
07/19/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Appearance. Representing appellant: Gregory L. Denue (mailed out receipt and copy of 5/19/00 order). 00-12485
12/13/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Fast Track. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 00-21799
01/08/2001Other Returned Unfiled Document. (appendix attached and late)
01/23/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-01361
01/23/2001AppendixReceived Appendix. Appellant's Appendix. 01-01364
01/31/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement and appendix provisionally submitted on January 23, 2001. 01-02033
01/31/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-01362
01/31/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-01364
02/09/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: 05/21/99 (2) and 05/26/99. Court Reporter: Diann Prock and Mary Beth Cook. Filed in district court on: February 7, 2001. 01-02711
02/22/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-03342
02/22/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Response. 01-03343
03/01/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: May 21, 2000. Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 01-03802
03/02/2001TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 5/26/99. Court Reporter: Mary Beth Cook. 01-03855
03/30/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We have determined that the transcript for the proceedings in district court on August 10, 1999 are necessary for this court's resolution of this appeal. Counsel for appellant shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a rough draft transcript request form in the district court and serve a copy of the request form upon the court reporter or recorder and opposing counsel. Counsel for appellant must also file with the clerk of this court 2 file-stamped copies of the request form and poof of service of the form upon the court reporter or recorder and opposing counsel. 01-05584
04/23/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: August 10, 1999. Court Reporter: Freelance Court Reporters. Filed in district court on: April 13, 2001. 01-06873
05/18/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 10, 1999. Court Reporter: Margaret Cardwell. 01-08323
06/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Remand. Order Vacating Judgment and Remanding. "ORDER the judgment of the district court VACATED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for the appointment of counsel and further proceedings consistent with this order." fn7[This order constitutes our final disposition of this appeal. Any subsequent appeal shall be docketed as a new matter.] SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-09815
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10329
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2001. 01-10329