judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

RUFUS JOHNSON V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.

Case Information: 10-AA-1417
Short Caption:RUFUS JOHNSON V. DC DEP'T OF EMPLOYMENT SERVS.Classification:Agency - Administrative Agency - Worker's Compensation
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CRB123-10Filed Date:11/17/2010

Opening Event Date:11/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/17/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/23/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/12/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/13/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
IntervenorTravelers Insurance CompanyN
Michael E. OllenNY
Intervenor-RespondentGreater Southeast Community HospitalN
Michael E. OllenYY
PetitionerRufus Johnson N
Matthew J. PefferYY
RespondentD.C. Department of Employment Services - Worker's Comp.N
Todd S. KimNY
James C. McKay, Jr.NY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/17/2010PETITION FOR REVIEW
11/17/2010FILING FEE of $100.00 paid
11/19/2010CERTIFIED COPY OF PETITION TO BOARD, Todd Kim, Esq. and Gregory Lamb, Esq.
12/17/2010RECORD ON APPEAL
12/17/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/23/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that petitioner's brief and the appendix shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and respondent's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 30, 31. (JAC)
02/01/2011PETITIONER'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 2/11/11
02/02/2011RECEIVED Petitioner's Brief (mpxb still pend).
02/02/2011RECEIVED Appendix to Appellant's Brief (mpxb still pend).
02/08/2011 ORDERED that the motion is granted and the lodged brief and appendix are filed. It is F/O that the brief of respondent shall be filed with this court on or before March 11, 2011. (JAC)
02/08/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF
02/08/2011APPENDIX
03/10/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE of Greater Southeast Community Hospital (Doctor's Community Healthcare) on behalf of Respondent.
03/10/2011RECEIVED Brief of Intervenor.
03/10/2011MEMORANDUM/STATEMENT IN LIEU OF BRIEF (DOES).
03/23/2011ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE and the Clerk shall enter the appearances of Greater Southeast Community Hospital and Travelers Insurance Company as intervenors in this matter. It is F/O that the Clerk shall file the lodged brief and appendix of intervenors. It is F/O that this matter shall be scheduled before a merits division of this court as soon the calendar permits. (ETW)
03/23/2011INTERVENOR'S BRIEF
03/23/2011APPENDIX
03/23/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
04/01/2011FiledFinal Screening-Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/12/2011FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Ruiz, Nebeker
05/22/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Washington, Chief Judge, Ruiz, Associate Judge, Retired, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
06/13/2012FiledMandate