judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-3956
B-3956
04/17/1973
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF FT. WORTH
MARY ELIZABETH CORBIN AND W. BOYD CORBIN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/04/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
05/16/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/04/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
04/17/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/04/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/16/1974Opinion issued
07/27/1973Notice from Counsel of a change in address
07/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
07/11/1973Document received (See Remarks)
05/16/1973Reply to Response
05/04/1973Response to Petition
04/17/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
04/17/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
City of Ft. WorthPetitioner
Mary Elizabeth Corbin and W. Boyd Corbin, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information