judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-3921
B-3921
03/27/1973
Application for Writ of Error
CHRISTENE MCMAHAN, AS SUCCESSOR ADMINISTRATRIX OF THE ESTATE OF G. L. HUCKABEE, DECEASED, AMERICA STATE BANK, LUBBOCK, TEXAS
J. O. DANNER, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS INDEPENDENT EXECUTOR OF THE ESTATE OF OLLIE LEE HUCKABEE DANNER, DECEASED
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/18/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/18/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/05/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
04/05/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
03/28/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
03/27/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/18/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/18/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/10/1973Response to Motion filed
04/05/1973Response to Petition
04/05/1973Response to Petition
03/28/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/27/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
03/27/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
America State Bank, Lubbock, TexasPetitioner
Christene McMahan, as Successor Administratrix of the Estate of G. L. Huckabee, deceasedPetitioner
J. O. Danner, individually and as Independent Executor of the Estate of Ollie Lee Huckabee Danner, deceasedRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information