judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SMITH (GERALD) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34864
Short Caption:SMITH (GERALD) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR971940Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/22/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09038
11/17/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11398
12/14/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12562
12/14/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/05/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2000. 99-12562