judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE MARRIAGE OF ESTUM

Case Information: 34621
Short Caption:IN RE MARRIAGE OF ESTUMCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9701209DClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:08/24/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/04/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from David A. Estum--check no. 634383765-0.
08/04/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07180
08/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-07596
08/17/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in Second Judicial District Court on: 8/13/99. 99-07684
08/24/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. 99-07881
08/24/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/24/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-09148
10/20/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal. 99-10215
10/20/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/22/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 21, 1999. 99-10215
10/28/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Issued Corrected Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal to Washoe Co. Clerk's Office (Case No. DV99-1297). 99-10586
11/04/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 1999. 99-10586