judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAUL WENDELL CHANDLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0009)
Case Number:S-07-0009Case Docketed On:01/10/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Albany CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:PAUL WENDELL CHANDLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:PAUL WENDELL CHANDLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPaul Wendell ChandlerDiane M. Lozano
Ryan R. Roden
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPatrick J. Crank
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/08/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/10/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/24/2007Order - Convert to petition - Order Converting Untimely Appeal to Writ of ReviewOrderConvert to petitionFinal
02/26/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/26/2007Order - Grant - extension of time - brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
04/12/2007Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
04/12/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/23/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with wavier (faxed)MotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
05/23/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
05/23/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal