judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-1365
B-1365
02/06/1969
Application for Writ of Error
BOCK JEWERLY COMPAY, INC. AND HARRY BOCK, DBA HARRY BOCK COMPANY, SAM BITKOWER
HANOVER FIRE INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/16/1969Motion for RehearingRespondent
02/26/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
02/18/1969Response to PetitionPetitioner
02/17/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
02/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
02/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
02/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/06/1969Response to Motion filed
04/24/1969Response to Motion filed
04/16/1969Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/26/1969Response to Petition
02/18/1969Response to Petition
02/17/1969Response to Petition
02/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/06/1969Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/06/1969Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bock Jewerly Compay, Inc. and Harry Bock, dba Harry Bock CompanyPetitioner
Hanover Fire Insurance CompanyRespondent
Sam BitkowerPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information