judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EVISTON VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 34863
Short Caption:EVISTON VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A399123Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/22/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Farmers Insurance Group of Companies--check no. 1173172100.
09/22/1999Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for a Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. 99-09015
09/22/1999MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Motion for Stay Pending Determination of Petition for Special Writ. 99-09016
09/24/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on the respondent district judge and on all parties to the action in the trial court. Due Date: 10 days 99-09152
09/30/1999Petition/WritFiled Supplement to Petition for Writ. Petitioner's Certificate of Service as to Petition for Writ of Prohibition and Notice of Errata. 99-09401
10/08/1999MotionFiled Motion. Petitioners' Request for Expedited Decision as to Motion for Stay Pending Determination of Petition for Special Writ. 99-09724
11/02/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due: 20 days from the date of this order. fn1[The court defers ruling on petitioners' motion for a stay until such time as it has received and considered the answer. It does not appear that petitioners initially sought a stay in the district court. The clerk shall amend this court's docket to reflect the caption set forth above]. (Caption amended). 99-10704
11/22/1999Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Louis R. Pushnick's Opposition to Petition for a Writ of Prohibition or, in the Alternative, Writ of Mandamus. 99-11657
12/06/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Petitioner Eviston's Notice of Change of Address. Turner & Curriden, and Samuel A. Kitterman Jr., have relocated: 1140 Town Center Dr., Ste 200-Las Vegas, NV 89144 99-12155
01/21/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay. Filed via fax. 00-01001
01/24/2000MotionFiled Motion for Stay. Emergency Motion for Stay. (original of fax filed on 1/21/00). 00-01137
02/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Temporary Stay. The proceedings in District Court Case No. A399123 are temporarily stayed until further order of this court. 00-01614
02/08/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Louis R. Pushnick's Opposition to Emergency Motion for Stay. 00-02020
05/08/2000Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition granted in Docket No. 33367; petition denied in Docket No. 34863." (Docket No. 33367 and Docket No. 34863 are not consolidated cases). Docket No. 33367: fn1[Real party in interest filed a motion requesting permission to file an untimely answer. Petitioners moved to strike the answer as untimely. We deny the motion to strike and grant the motion to file the answer. We direct the clerk of the court to file the answer and appendix received from real party in interest as well as petitioners' opposition to the motion to file an untimely answer.] We direct the clerk of this court to issue a writ of mandamus. Docket No. 34863: fn2[Petitioners requested that this court stay the district court proceedings. On February 1, 2000, we entered a temporary stay. We vacate our order granting the temporary stay.] Before Maupin, Shearing and Becker, JJ. Per Curiam. 116 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 60. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB Nos. 33367, 34863. 00-07455
06/05/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-09373
06/05/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.