judyrecords
search tips
720 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DOROTHY PIERCE V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORP.,ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1412
Short Caption:DOROTHY PIERCE V. WASHINGTON HOSPITAL CENTER CORP.,ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAM7901-08Filed Date:11/03/2010

Opening Event Date:11/03/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/16/2010

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDorothy Pierce N
David F. HallNN
Lesley S. Zork NN
AppelleeWashington Hospital Center CorporationN
Crystal S. DeeseNY
AppelleeBarlow S. Lynch N
Larry D. McAfeeNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/03/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/19/2010STIPULATION TO DISMISS APPEAL
11/23/2010 On consideration of the stipulation of dismissal filed by the parties, inadvertently filed in the trial court, and accepted for filing in this court, it is ORDERED that this appeal is hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13 (b)(2). (ETW) elp
11/23/2010DISMISSED
12/16/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived