judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KERRY JOHN GARNICA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0233)
Case Number:S-10-0233Case Docketed On:10/29/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KERRY JOHN GARNICA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KERRY JOHN GARNICA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKerry John GarnicaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie
Meri Vania Geringer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 85
Citation:253 P.3d 489

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/29/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/16/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
12/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/31/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
02/22/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
02/22/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
02/25/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Meri Geringer, Assistant Attorney General, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
02/28/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
02/28/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
03/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David E. Westling for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
03/15/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Meri Geringer, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
03/15/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/26/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part, reversing in part, and remanding. Justice Hill writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
05/31/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 5/27/2011 by agent for Warden at Honor Conservation Camp & Boot Camp.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/13/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/13/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/14/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
06/15/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Mandate signed for 6/14/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal