judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ALBERT R. ZARATE

Case Information: 10-BG-1392
Short Caption:IN RE: ALBERT R. ZARATEClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN388-10Filed Date:11/10/2010

Opening Event Date:11/10/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
William R. RossNY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentAlbert R. Zarate N
Robert J. SpagnolettiNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/10/2010DISCIPLINARY LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel with a certified copy of the criminal judgment concerning respondent. Respondent pled guilty on Aulgust 23, 2010, in the Fairfax County, Virginia, General District Court to petit larceny, a violation of Virginia Code 18.2-96.
12/06/2010ORDER It appearing that respondent pled guilty in the Fairfax County, Virginia General District Court to petit larceny, the Court having received certified copies of the criminal judgment, and it appearing that the offense constitutes a serious crime as defined by D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (b), it is ORDERED pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 10 (c), that the respondent, Albert R. Zarate, is suspended immediately from the practice of law in the District of Columbia pending resolution of this matter, and the Board on Professional Responsibility is directed to institute a formal proceeding to determine the nature of the offense and whether it involves moral turpitude within the meaning of D.C. Code Sec 11-2503 (a)(2001). It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirements of D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement based on compliance with Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Bar Counsel inform the Court if the matter is resolved without the necessity of further court action. (ETW)
12/16/2010AFFIDAVIT of respondent.
05/14/2012FiledReport And Recommendation Of The BPR On Referral by the Ad Hoc Hearing Committee requesting approval of the petition for negotiated discipline, and that the court suspend respondent for 90 days to be served nunc pro tunc from December 16, 2010 to March 16, 2011. (Petitioner Board on Professional Responsibility)
09/17/2012FiledTMC//REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF AD HOC HEARING COMMITTEE RECOMMENDATION NEGOTIATED DISCIPLINE
09/27/2012FiledSuspended - ORDERED that Albert R. Zarate is suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia for the period of ninety days, nunc pro tunc to December 30, 2010, the date he filed his affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g).