judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GUTHRIE (LELAND) VS. NV DEPT. OF PRISONS

Case Information: 34855
Short Caption:GUTHRIE (LELAND) VS. NV DEPT. OF PRISONSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Criminal - Proper Person Writ Petition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/21/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/21/1999Petition/WritFiled Proper Person Petition for Writ. Petition for Peremptory Writ of Prohibition. 99-08923
10/14/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. This court directs the state, on behalf of respondent, to respond within 30 days of the date of this order, and show cause why a writ should not issue directing the Department to cease charging petitioner for necessary medical treatment. 99-09962
11/09/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Order to Show Cause. 99-11075
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The state shall have to and including December 3, 1999, to file the response to this court's show cause order of October 14, 1999. 99-11179
12/03/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-12120
01/20/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. Order Denying Petition for Writ of Prohibition. " . . . we deny this petition." fn1[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-00927
02/15/2000RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 00-02358
02/15/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.