judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: ROBERT P. KAUFMAN

Case Information: 10-BG-1396
Short Caption:IN RE: ROBERT P. KAUFMANClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN338-05Filed Date:11/12/2010

Opening Event Date:11/12/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:01/04/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/01/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
H. Clay Smith, IIINY
Wallace E. Shipp NN
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentRobert P. Kaufman N
Abraham C. BlitzerNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/12/2010REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. The find that respondent violated Rules 1.1(a), 1.3(a) and (b), 1.4(a) and 1.16(d) and recommend that respondent be publicly censured.
11/30/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel taking no exception to the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility.
01/04/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
01/04/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I
02/02/2011CALENDAR NOTICE SENT
03/01/2011FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
03/01/2011SUBMITTED to Judge Ruiz,King,Belson,
03/10/2011FiledPUBLICLY CENSURED ORDERED that Robert P. Kaufman is hereby publicly censured. (RZ,BR,KG)