judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

KELLY DAVID ROBINSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0234)
Case Number:S-10-0234Case Docketed On:10/29/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Crook CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:KELLY DAVID ROBINSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:KELLY DAVID ROBINSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantKelly David RobinsonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Leda M. Pojman
Gregory A. Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 101
Citation:253 P.3d 1148

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
10/29/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
10/29/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
10/29/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
12/16/2010Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
12/16/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time of file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/17/2010Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
01/31/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/31/2011Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other Order granting Appellant's motion to proceed in forma pauperis and appointing the Public Defender to represent Appellant on appeal.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
01/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/09/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/29/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
03/31/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
03/31/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-III, Original Papers; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
03/31/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Leda Pojman for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/24/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda M. Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/24/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/29/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/05/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Opinion signed for 6/30/2011 by agent for Warden at WSP.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
07/07/2011Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
07/07/2011Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
07/07/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Brief in Support of Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/25/2011Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
07/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/25/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/28/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal