judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JOSEPH L. JACKSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1402
Short Caption:JOSEPH L. JACKSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Bail Reform Act
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD14756-10Filed Date:11/04/2010

Opening Event Date:11/04/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/07/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/25/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJoseph L. Jackson YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/04/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Raymond Rigat, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
11/22/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Raymond Rigat, Esquire
12/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
12/07/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (89pgs/Tape) 10/6/08 proc. w/CD
12/07/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/21/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/27/2010APPELLANT'S BRIEF appendix attached
12/27/2010APPENDIX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/25/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
01/26/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - appellant's brief/appendix
03/31/2011 ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS GRANTED...SEE HARDCOPY It is *****MORE*****
03/31/2011 FURTHER ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the judgment is AFFIRMED. (RDKRTE) (rf)
04/11/2011CJA ATTORNEY'S QUALLS LETTER
04/25/2011MANDATE ISSUED