Case: B-7439
B-7439
03/10/1978
Application for Writ of Error
ARMSTRONG RUBBER COMPANY
CONRADA URQUIDEZ AND CLEMENTE URQUIDEZ JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/21/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Respondent | | |
05/08/1978 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
03/10/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/21/1978 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
07/05/1978 | Opinion issued | | ||
05/08/1978 | Response to Petition | | ||
04/26/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/26/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
04/26/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
03/10/1978 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
03/10/1978 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Armstrong Rubber Company | Petitioner | |
Conrada Urquidez and Clemente Urquidez Jr. | Respondent |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information